VA HB1240 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0330)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0330)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Amherst. Alters the election of members of the town council of the Town of Amherst from two-year terms to four-year staggered terms. This bill is identical to SB 871.
Title
Amherst, Town of; amending charter, alters election of members of town council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0330) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 330 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1240ER) |
2018-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-02 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102878D |