VA HB124 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Hunting deer; use of .22 caliber rifle authorized. Hunting deer; use of .22 caliber rifle authorized. Authorizes the use of a rifle equipped with .22 caliber centerfire ammunition for hunting big game. Current Department of Wildlife Resources regulations allow the use of rifles with a caliber of .23 or greater.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting deer; authorizes use of .22 caliber rifle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-15HouseLeft in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2022-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N)
2022-01-31HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
2022-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2022-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101557D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291519(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback