VA HB124 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB124
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Minority Business Commission; report. Establishes a 13-member legislative Commission to promote the growth and competitiveness of Virginia minority-owned businesses. The bill provides that the Commission sunsets on July 1, 2023.
Title
Virginia Minority Business Commission; established, report, sunset provision.
Sponsors
Del. Jason Miyares [R] | Del. Joshua Cole [D] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] | Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] |
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-12-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100842D |
Same As/Similar To
HB124 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote