VA HB124 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax; general reassessment. Authorizes Bedford County to perform a general reassessment of real property every five or six years instead of every four years.
Title
Real property tax; Bedford County authorized to conduct general reassessment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 24 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 1, 2018 | |
2018-02-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/22/18 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB124ER) |
2018-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-22 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-12-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-12-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101634D |