VA HB1238 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Valluvar Way. Designates Brentwall Drive in Fairfax County as "Valluvar Way." Valluvar Way. Designates Brentwall Drive in Fairfax County as "Valluvar Way."
Title
Valluvar Way; designating as Brentwall Drive in Fairfax County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 517 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 9, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1238ER) |
2022-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 22104412D-E |
2022-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1238E |
2022-02-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104412D |