VA HB1233 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1233
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Unpaved secondary highway funds; improvements; report. Provides that improvements to nonsurface treated secondary highways may, at the discretion of the locality, include changes other than paving, including enhanced maintenance and capital improvements to such highway. The bill directs the Department of Transportation to review and consider methods of improving unpaved secondary highways other than paving such highways and report its findings and recommendations to the Chairs of the House and Senate Committees on Transportation by November 1, 2024.
Title
Unpaved secondary highway funds; improvements, enhanced maintenances, report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103504D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1233 (Carry Over) 2024-02-01 - Continued to 2025 in Rules by voice vote