VA HB1228 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission; court records; online access to case management systems. Provides that if a clerk of the circuit court provides secure remote access to nonconfidential court records, the clerk shall, by a signed agreement with the Director of the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission, provide secure remote access to such records to staff of the Commission. The bill clarifies that a clerk is not prohibited from providing online access to a case management system to any person designated by law to prepare sentencing guidelines. Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission; court records; online access to case management systems. Provides that if a clerk of the circuit court provides secure remote access to nonconfidential court records, the clerk shall, by a signed agreement with the Director of the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission, provide secure remote access to such records to staff of the Commission. The bill clarifies that a clerk is not prohibited from providing online access to a case management system to any person designated by law to prepare sentencing guidelines. The bill also requires the clerk of each circuit court to provide online access to a case management system that may include abstracts of case filings and proceedings in the circuit courts to the Commission for purposes related to the preparation of sentencing guidelines. The bill requires the Commission to ensure the confidentiality and security of the information obtained through such online access and prohibits the Commission from publishing personal or case identifying information. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission.
Title
Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission; court records, online access to case management systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2024-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government and Capital Outlay |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103272D |