VA HB1225 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Energy performance-based contracts; roof replacement. Allows procurement of a roof replacement as part of a larger energy conservation or operational efficiency measure if such replacement is either necessary for the installation of such measure or if the contracting entity determines that the replacement of more. The bill requires any roof replacements not included in the original contract to be publicly noticed on the Department of General Services' central electronic procurement website. Such procurement shall be designed by a licensed architect or professional engineer. Current law prohibits the inclusion of a roof replacement project as part of an energy performance-based contract.
Title
Energy performance-based contracts; roof replacement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 465 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1225ER) |
2022-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22103378D |
Same As/Similar To
SB13 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)
SB13 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)
SB13 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0466)