VA HB1225 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0668)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0668)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; notice before terminating service. Prohibits an electric utility from terminating the residential service of a customer for nonpayment for metered services when the electric utility believes that the customer is receiving or has received electric utility services for which the customer was not properly billed as the result of tampering with the electric utility's meter until the electric utility has (i) retrieved the meter from the customer's premises, which may be done without providing prior notice to the customer; (ii) immediately replaced it with a new meter; and (iii) determined whether the meter has been tampered with. The measure requires that if the electric utility determines that the meter has been tampered with and seeks payment for services not properly billed, the electric utility must provide the customer with an invoice with a reasonable and final estimate of the amount owed by the customer as a result of the meter's failure. The electric utility is required to provide the customer one full billing period to pay the amount billed in such invoice. The measure authorizes a customer to submit a complaint to the State Corporation Commission and to file a formal proceeding after the informal complaint process has been exhausted. The measure includes specific conditions for which these requirements do not apply, including when the condition of a customer's wiring, equipment, or appliances is either unsafe or unsuitable for receiving the utility service or when the customer's use of the utility service or equipment interferes with or may be detrimental to the utility's facilities or to the provision of utility service by the utility to any other customer.
Title
Electric utilities; notice before terminating service.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (93-Y 4-N) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0668) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 668 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1225ER) |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (93-Y 4-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20109390D-S1 (93-Y 4-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1225S1 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20109390D-S1 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20109390D-S1 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1225H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107201D-H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107201D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104117D |