VA HB1224 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Neighborhood Assistance Act Tax Credit. Makes localities' health clinics providing free medical services by volunteer health practitioners eligible to receive tax credits that can be transferred to professionals donating their services to the programs.
Title
Neighborhood Assistance Act Tax Credit; certain health clinics eligible to receive.
Sponsors
Del. James Scott [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Senate: Left in Finance | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Printed as engrossed 10103846D-E | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1224E | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-10 | House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2010-01-15 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-15 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10103846D |