VA HB1223 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; foundations; annual reporting requirements. Requires each public institution of higher education to release an annual report regarding foundations associated with the institution setting forth foundation expenses. The annual report shall include the total annual expenditures by each foundation; the percentage of expenditures used for scholarships or financial aid by each foundation; the percentage of expenditures used for faculty compensation by each foundation; the percentage of expenditures used for program costs by each foundation; the percentage of expenditures used for equipment and technology by each foundation; the percentage of expenditures used for administrative support by each foundation; and the percentage of expenditures used for executive compensation by each foundation.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; foundations, annual reporting requirements, VCCS exempt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0511) | |
2020-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 511 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1223ER) |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108237D-S1 (95-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1223S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108237D-S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108237D-S1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (94-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Education (18-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102558D |