VA HB1217 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Waterworks; yield testing; monitoring of existing active wells. Provides that, prior to issuing a permit to operate a waterworks, the Commissioner of Health shall require a yield test of such waterworks system, which shall include monitoring of all active wells located within 500 feet of the water source for the waterworks system for which the permit is sought or, if no existing active wells are located within 500 feet of such water source, of all existing active wells located on lots that are adjacent to the lot on which the water source is located to determine the impact of the waterworks for which a permit is sought on such existing active wells. The Commissioner shall deny the permit if, during the course of such monitoring, any of such existing active wells shows a reduction in well efficiency of five percent or more or is unable to supply the dwelling it serves with a continuous water supply for a minimum of 20 minutes at the maximum pumping rate.
Title
Waterworks; yield testing of system, monitoring of existing active wells.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102995D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1217 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1217+hil |