VA HB121 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Incorporated by Labor and Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases. Adds cancers of the colon, brain, and testes to the list of cancers that are presumed to be an occupational disease covered by the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act when firefighters and certain employees develop the cancer.
Title
Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | House | Incorporated by Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB783-Askew) by voice vote |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2019-12-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101260D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB121 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB121+hil |