VA HB1204 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Real property tax; open space; special and separate assessment in certain counties. Requires the assessing official in any county that experienced at least a 14 percent increase in population from 2010 to 2016 to specially and separately assess real property that is devoted to open space use and that contains at least 20 acres on the basis of the actual physical use of the property, if requested to do so by the owner. The measure is effective for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real property tax; special and separate assessment of open space in certain counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (58-Y 37-N 2-A) (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 33-N 1-A) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto
2018-04-09 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1204ER)
2018-03-08HouseEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (58-Y 37-N 2-A)
2018-03-06HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (58-Y 37-N 2-A)
2018-03-05HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-01SenatePassed Senate with amendment (27-Y 13-N)
2018-03-01SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2018-03-01SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-03-01SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-03-01SenateRead third time
2018-02-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27SenateReported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 4-N 1-A)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 33-N 1-A)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House (65-Y 33-N 1-A)
2018-02-12HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-09HouseRead first time
2018-02-07HouseReported from Finance (18-Y 3-N)
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 1-N)
2018-01-30HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100591D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813284.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1204
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1204+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1204ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1001V0040+HB1204
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H10V0045+HB1204
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H10V0069+HB1204
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0720+HB1204
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0341+HB1204
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0749HB1204+HB1204
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0818HB1204+HB1204
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1353+HB1204

Bill Comments

feedback