VA HB1203 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0322)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tax credit for participating landlords. Increases from $250,000 to $500,000 the maximum amount of tax credits that may be issued to participating landlords, as defined in relevant law, each fiscal year beginning with fiscal year 2025 and provides that, in the event that the amount of the qualified requests for tax credits for such participating landlords in the fiscal year exceeds $500,000, the Department of Housing and Community Development will prorate the tax credits among the qualified applicants. The bill also creates a pilot program that earmarks $100,000 for tax credits provided to a participating landlord renting a qualified housing unit in an eligible non-metropolitan census tract, as those terms are defined in the bill. Tax credit for participating landlords. Increases from $250,000 to $500,000 the maximum amount of tax credits that may be issued to participating landlords, as defined in relevant law, each fiscal year beginning with fiscal year 2025 and provides that, in the event that the amount of the qualified requests for tax credits for such participating landlords in the fiscal year exceeds $500,000, the Department of Housing and Community Development will prorate the tax credits among the qualified applicants. The bill also creates a pilot program that earmarks $100,000 for tax credits provided to a participating landlord renting a qualified housing unit in an eligible non-metropolitan census tract, as those terms are defined in the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlords, participating; increases tax credit that may be issued.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (83-Y 13-N) (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-02 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0322)
2024-04-02 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 322 (effective 7/1/24)
2024-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024
2024-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024
2024-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1203ER)
2024-03-05HouseEnrolled
2024-02-28SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2024-02-28SenateRead third time
2024-02-27SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2024-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2024-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2024-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2024-02-09HouseVOTE: Passage (83-Y 13-N)
2024-02-09HouseRead third time and passed House (83-Y 13-N)
2024-02-08HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1203H2
2024-02-08HouseCommittee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 24107063D-H2
2024-02-08HouseCommittee from Finance substitute rejected 24106413D-H1
2024-02-08HouseRead second time
2024-02-07HouseRead first time
2024-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 24107063D-H2
2024-02-05HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2024-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2024-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 24106413D-H1
2024-01-31HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2024-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2024-01-31HouseReported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2024-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2024-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2024-01-25HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2024-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2024-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103177D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581439.12:04(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HB1203
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB1203+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB1203H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB1203H2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB1203ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+CHAP0322+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/24106413D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/24106413D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB1203F161+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB1203FH2161+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+oth+HB1203FER161+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H1001V0009+HB1203
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H10V0020+HB1203
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H0201V0019+HB1203
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+H02V0062+HB1203
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+HV0502+HB1203
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0698HB1203+HB1203
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+S05V0432+HB1203
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+vot+SV0727HB1203+HB1203

Bill Comments

feedback