VA HB1203 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Nonsuits; recommencement of action. Decreases the time period in which a plaintiff who takes a voluntary nonsuit may recommence this action from six months to 14 days from the date the nonsuit was entered. The bill does not change the provision allowing for recommencement of the action within the original period of limitation, if longer than 14 days from the date the nonsuit was entered. The bill further provides that a plaintiff who has taken a voluntary nonsuit shall serve the defendant within three months of the recommencement of the action. The bill contains a technical amendment.
Title
Nonsuits; recommencement of action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100627D |