VA HB1202 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electrical transmission lines; approval of underground construction; pilot program. Establishes a pilot program consisting of the approval of the underground construction of two electrical transmission lines. As a part of the pilot program, the State Corporation Commission (SCC) is directed to approve as a qualifying project a transmission line that appears to track the I-66 Hybrid Route that has been considered in the application of Dominion Energy for the Haymarket transmission line project in Prince William County. The measure establishes criteria to be used by the SCC in approving the second project. The approval of a transmission line satisfies local zoning requirements. The SCC is directed to approve a rate adjustment clause to allow the utility to recover from the utility's Virginia jurisdictional customers the costs of the project that are not otherwise recoverable under existing provisions. The measure directs the SCC to submit annual reports on the pilot program.
Title
Electrical transmission lines; approval of underground construction, establishes pilot program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1558-Kilgore) by voice vote |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104402D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1202 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1202+hil |