VA HB120 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0040)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0040)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special hunting and fishing license for certain disabled veterans. Authorizes resident veterans who have a service-connected disability of at least 30 percent to receive from the Department of Wildlife Resources, at no cost or a reduced cost depending on the veteran's disability rating, a lifetime license to hunt and freshwater fish. Current law authorizes the provision of such license at no cost to a veteran who is totally and permanently disabled and at half-cost to a veteran who is 70 percent disabled.
Title
Disabled veterans, certain; special hunting and fishing licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0040) | |
2022-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 40 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB120ER) |
2022-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2022-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101550D |