VA HB1199 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0795)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0795)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative Process Act; right to counsel in rule-making proceedings. Provides that in formulating any regulation or in evidentiary hearings on regulations, an interested party shall be entitled to be accompanied by and represented by counsel or other qualified representative. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Administrative Process Act; right to counsel in rule-making proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0795) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 795 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1199ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-29 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1199ER) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-02 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2012-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-19 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12103368D |