VA HB1198 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (8-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (8-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Attorney General; instituting or conducting criminal prosecutions for cases involving criminal sexual assault. Authorizes the Attorney General to institute or conduct criminal prosecutions in cases involving violations of criminal sexual assault when such crimes are committed against children. Attorney General; instituting or conducting criminal prosecutions for cases involving criminal sexual assault. Authorizes the Attorney General to institute or conduct criminal prosecutions in cases involving violations of criminal sexual assault when such crimes are committed against children.
Title
Attorney General; instituting/conducting crim. prosecutions for certain violence against children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (8-Y 7-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (51-Y 48-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1198H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22104934D-H1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 22104934D-H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 9-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-29 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104338D |