VA HB1198 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Board of Workforce Development; updates as a response to federal law. Amends current provisions regarding the Virginia Board of Workforce Development to align with federal law and gives the Board autonomy in making decisions on staffing needs and committee structures.
Title
Workforce Development, Virginia Board of; membership, updates as a response to federal law.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 58 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020 | |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1198ER) |
2020-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-27 | House | VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1198H1 |
2020-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106216D-H1 |
2020-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106216D-H1 |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Adminstrative Process |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102731D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2471 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2471.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2472 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |