VA HB1194 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1194

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Dairy Producer Margin Coverage Premium Assistance Program. Directs the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services to establish and administer the Dairy Producer Margin Coverage Premium Assistance Program (the Program). The bill provides that any dairy farmer that has a resource management plan or nutrient management plan and participates in the federal margin coverage program for dairy producers at the Tier 1 level as contained in the federal Agriculture Improvement Act of 2018 is eligible to participate in the Program. Under the bill, each year a Program participant will receive a refund of its annual premium payment paid into the federal program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dairy Producer Margin Coverage Premium Assistance Program; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25SenateContinued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N)
2020-02-18SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105211D

Same As/Similar To

HB1194 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
323304(n/a)See Bill Text
323305(n/a)See Bill Text
323306(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback