VA HB1193 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0621)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0621)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Medical Assistance Services; coordinated specialty care; work group established. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to establish a work group, in coordination with the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, to evaluate and make recommendations to improve approaches to early psychosis and mood disorder detection approaches, make program funding recommendations, recommend a core set of standardized clinical and outcome measures, and evaluate coordinated specialty care programs in the Commonwealth. The work group is required by the bill to submit a five-year strategic plan annually to the General Assembly beginning November 1, 2022.
Title
Medical Assistance Services, Department of; coordinated specialty care, work group established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0621) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 621 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1193ER) |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104391D |