VA HB1193 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Persons acquitted by reason of insanity; commitment; sentencing. Provides that a person who is acquitted by reason of insanity of an offense and convicted of another offense must serve his sentence for the conviction prior to being committed for inpatient hospitalization or, if the person has already been committed at the time of the conviction, be transferred to the custody of the correctional facility where he is to serve his sentence and returned to commitment upon completion of his sentence.
Title
Persons acquitted by reason of insanity; commitment for inpatient hospitalization.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (66-Y 30-N 1-A) (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (7-Y 5-N) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (7-Y 5-N) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768) | |
2018-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 768 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1193ER) |
2018-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-07 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (66-Y 30-N 1-A) |
2018-03-07 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (66-Y 30-N 1-A) |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (7-Y 5-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-09 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2018-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2018-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1193H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18106559D-H1 |
2018-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106559D-H1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100341D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 169.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 182.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 40.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |