VA HB1192 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Attorney General; prosecution of certain criminal cases. Provides that with the concurrence of the local attorney for the Commonwealth, the Attorney General may institute or conduct criminal prosecutions in the circuit courts of the Commonwealth for violations of unlicensed activity for any profession or occupation regulated under Title 54.1 and for unlicensed activity by any private security services business regulated under the authority of the Department of Criminal Justice Services.
Title
Attorney General; prosecution of certain criminal cases in circuit courts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103120D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB1192 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1192+hil |