VA HB1177 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Failed to report (defeated) in Education (9-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Failed to report (defeated) in Education (9-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School board policies; homework assignments; Internet connection. Requires each school board to establish a policy to prohibit any teacher in the school division from assigning to any student a homework assignment that requires the use of an Internet connection that is capable of transmitting information at a rate that is not less than 256 kilobits per second in at least one direction when such student lacks meaningful access to such an Internet connection.
Title
School board policies; homework assignments, Internet connection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Education (9-Y 10-N) (Y: 9 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Education (9-Y 10-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103485D |