VA HB1174 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0562)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Newborn screening; lysosomal storage disorders. Directs the Board of Health to amend regulations governing newborn screening to include screening for Pompe disease and mucopolysaccharidosis type 1 (MPS-1). This bill is identical to SB 449.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Newborn screening; screening for Pompe disease, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0562)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 562 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-12SenateSigned by President
2018-03-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-10HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1174ER)
2018-03-10HouseEnrolled
2018-03-08HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
2018-03-08HouseConference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2018-02-27SenateSenators: Chafin, Dunnavant, Barker
2018-02-27SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-02-27HouseDelegates: Pillion, Orrock, Hayes
2018-02-27HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-02-26HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-02-23SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-02-23SenateSenate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N)
2018-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N)
2018-02-21HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 18107208D-S1 (1-Y 98-N)
2018-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-19SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1174S1
2018-02-19SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107208D-S1
2018-02-19SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-19SenateRead third time
2018-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-15SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107208D-S1
2018-02-15SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-12HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09HousePrinted as engrossed 18105875D-EH1
2018-02-09HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1174EH1
2018-02-09HouseAmendment by Delegate Pillion agreed to
2018-02-09HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18105875D-H1
2018-02-09HouseRead second time
2018-02-08HouseRead first time
2018-02-06HouseCommittee substitute printed 18105875D-H1
2018-02-06HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2018-01-18HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2018-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104484D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32165(n/a)See Bill Text
32165.1(n/a)See Bill Text
32167(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1174
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1174+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1174H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1174EH1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1174S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1174ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0562+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1201V0017+HB1174
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H12V0082+HB1174
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0538+HB1174
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0216+HB1174
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0539HB1174+HB1174
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0543HB1174+HB1174
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0911+HB1174
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0665HB1174+HB1174
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0934HB1174+HB1174
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1485+HB1174

Bill Comments

feedback