VA HB1170 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; conduct of election; provisional voting procedures; type of identification to be noted. Requires officers of election to note on the green envelope used for persons voting provisionally the specific type of identification presented by the voter. Current law only requires officers to note whether or not identification was presented.
Title
Elections; conduct of election, provisional voting procedures, type of identification to be noted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Election Administration |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103878D |