VA HB1170 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Stormwater management; separately built single-family residences. Expands the exemption from state stormwater permit requirements for certain separately built single-family residences by raising the area of disturbance for exempt projects from one acre to three acres. The bill does not alter the disturbance area for projects located in jurisdictions designated as subject to the Chesapeake Bay Preservation Area Designation and Management Regulations.
Title
Stormwater management; separately built single-family residences.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-20 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Chesapeake |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103536D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB1170 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1170+hil |