VA HB117 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0148)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0148)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Attorneys; examinations and issuance of licenses; requirements. Requires, before an applicant is permitted to take the Virginia bar exam, that the applicant furnish to the Board of Bar Examiners satisfactory evidence that he has satisfactorily completed legal studies amounting to at least five semesters, or the equivalent of at least five semesters on a system other than a semester system, of full-time study at a law school approved by the American Bar Association or the Board of Bar Examiners. Under current law, an applicant is required to have completed all degree requirements of such law school.
Title
Attorneys; examinations and issuance of licenses, requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0148) | |
2022-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 148 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB117ER) |
2022-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103824D |