VA HB1169 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Education
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Education
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public elementary and secondary school teachers; probationary term of service. Provides that a probationary term of service of at least three years shall be required before a public elementary or secondary school teacher is issued a continuing contract. Current law provides that a probationary term of service of at least three years and, at the option of the local school board, up to five years in the same school division shall be required before a public elementary or secondary school teacher is issued a continuing contract.
Title
Public elementary and secondary school teachers; probationary term of service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | House | Incorporated by Education |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB365-Carroll Foy) by voice vote |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103580D |
Same As/Similar To
HB365 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1169 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1169+hil |