VA HB1169 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0045)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0045)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concealed handgun permit; retired member of enforcement division of DMV; exception. Provides an exception for a concealed handgun permit for a qualifying retired member of the enforcement division of the Department of Motor Vehicles.
Title
Concealed handgun permit; retired member of Department of Motor Vehicles enforcement division.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0045) | |
2014-02-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 45 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-17 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1169ER) |
2014-02-17 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-24 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2014-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14104019D |
Same As/Similar To
SB279 (Same As) 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0450)