VA HB1168 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1168
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax; exemption for disabled veterans and surviving spouses. Provides that a person who is eligible for the real property tax exemption for certain disabled veterans and surviving spouses is entitled to a refund, retroactive to his date of eligibility, of taxes paid during the period of exemption, excluding interest or penalties. Under the bill, the refund is exempt from the statute of limitations for applications for correction of an assessment.
Title
Real property; tax exemption for certain disabled veterans and surviving spouses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Senate | Left in Finance and Appropriations |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22103495D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1168 (Carry Over) 2022-03-02 - Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3219.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3219.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3980 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |