VA HB1167 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Jury commissioners; lists of unqualified persons provided to general registrars. Requires jury commissioners to collect the information obtained from those persons not qualified to serve as jurors as a result of (i) not being a citizen of the United States, (ii) no longer being a resident of the Commonwealth, (iii) being a resident of another county or city in the Commonwealth, (iv) having been convicted of a felony and not having had voting rights restored, or (v) having been adjudicated incapacitated and disqualified to vote and not having had voting rights restored. The bill authorizes the sheriff, clerk of court, or other official responsible for maintaining such information provided by the commissioners to enter into an agreement with the general registrar for the locality to make that information available to that general registrar. The bill also requires the general registrars to use the information received to identify voters who are no longer qualified to vote and to initiate list maintenance procedures pursuant to current law. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jury commissioners; lists of unqualified persons provided to general registrars.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (58-Y 42-N) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (52-Y 46-N) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 8-N) (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto
2018-04-09 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2018-03-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-14HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
2018-03-08SenateSigned by President
2018-03-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1167ER)
2018-03-05HouseEnrolled
2018-03-01HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (58-Y 42-N)
2018-03-01HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (58-Y 42-N)
2018-02-28HousePassed by for the day
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-26SenatePassed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N)
2018-02-26SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2018-02-26SenateReading of amendments waived
2018-02-26SenateRead third time
2018-02-23SenatePassed by for the day
2018-02-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (8-Y 6-N)
2018-02-14SenateRereferred to Privileges and Elections
2018-02-14SenateRereferred from Courts of Justice (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-09HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (52-Y 46-N)
2018-02-09HouseRead third time and passed House (52-Y 46-N)
2018-02-08HousePrinted as engrossed 18101449D-E
2018-02-08HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1167E
2018-02-08HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-08HouseRead second time
2018-02-07HouseRead first time
2018-02-05HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (10-Y 8-N)
2018-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N)
2018-01-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101449D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242427(n/a)See Bill Text
801345(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1167
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1167+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1167E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1167ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0803V0018+HB1167
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0088+HB1167
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0496+HB1167
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0308+HB1167
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S08V0110+HB1167
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0639HB1167+HB1167
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0702HB1167+HB1167
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1226+HB1167

Bill Comments

feedback