VA HB1165 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Statewide electronic filing system; circuit courts, general district courts, and juvenile and domestic relations district courts; Supreme Court of Virginia to establish. Directs the Supreme Court of Virginia to establish and operate a system for electronic filing for civil and criminal proceedings for all circuit courts, general district courts, and juvenile and domestic relations district courts on or before July 1, 2026. The bill further directs the Supreme Court to promulgate rules to govern such filing system.
Title
Statewide electronic filing system; circuit courts, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103563D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 258.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 315.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |