VA HB1162 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0454)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0454)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Environmental Quality; environmental justice. Provides that one of the purposes of the Department of Environmental Quality is to further environmental justice, as defined in the bill.
Title
Environmental Quality, Department of; definition of environmental justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 43-N) (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0454) | |
2020-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 454 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1162ER) |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (53-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (8-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101702D |