VA HB1161 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0520)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act; required disclosures for buyer to beware; lead pipes. Adds to the disclosure statement required to be furnished by the owner of residential real property to a buyer that the buyer beware and exercise necessary due diligence with respect to whether the property contains any pipe, pipe or plumbing fitting, fixture, solder, or flux that does not meet the federal Safe Drinking Water Act definition of "lead free." The bill also requires any licensee who is engaged by a landlord and who has actual knowledge of the existence of any pipe, pipe or plumbing fitting, fixture, solder, or flux that does not meet the federal Safe Drinking Water Act definition of "lead free" to disclose such information to a prospective tenant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act; required disclosures, lead pipes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0520)
2020-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 520 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-04SenateSigned by President
2020-03-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-03HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1161ER)
2020-03-03HouseEnrolled
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-24SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-02-24SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-24SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-24SenateRead third time
2020-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1161H1
2020-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107141D-H1
2020-02-06HouseRead second time
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-04HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107141D-H1
2020-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101690D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511218.1(n/a)See Bill Text
551705.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1161&201+sum+HB1161
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1161+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1161H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1161ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0520+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1102V0059+HB1161
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1102V0086+HB1161
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0239+HB1161
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0631+HB1161
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0178+HB1161
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0846HB1161+HB1161
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0863HB1161+HB1161
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1434+HB1161

Bill Comments

feedback