VA HB1160 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unlawful detention of United States citizens. Provides that no agency of the Commonwealth, political subdivision of the Commonwealth, employee of either acting in his official capacity, or member of the Virginia National Guard or Virginia Defense Force, when such member is serving in the Virginia National Guard or the Virginia Defense Force on official state duty, shall knowingly aid an agency of the armed forces of the United States in the detention of any citizen pursuant to the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2012 if such aid would knowingly place any state agency, political subdivision, employee of such state agency or political subdivision, or member of the Virginia National Guard or the Virginia Defense Force in violation of the United States Constitution, the Constitution of Virginia, any provision of the Code of Virginia, any act of the General Assembly, or any regulation of the Virginia Administrative Code. The act does not apply to participation by state or local law enforcement or Virginia National Guard or Virginia Defense Force in joint task forces, partnerships, or other similar cooperative agreements with federal law enforcement as long as they are not for the purpose of participating in such detentions.
Title
Unlawful detention of U.S. citizens; prevents any agency, etc., from assisting in investigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 7-N) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate receded from amendment (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration receding from amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate receded from amendment (28-Y 10-N) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 51-N) (Y: 50 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Motion to recommit to committee rejected (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 4-N 3-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 7-N) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate receded from amendment (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration receding from amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate receded from amendment (28-Y 10-N) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 51-N) (Y: 50 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Motion to recommit to committee rejected (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 4-N 3-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 792 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1160ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 1-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 7-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (89-Y 7-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's substitute bill reprinted 12106374D-H2 | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's substitute printed 12106374D-H2 | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-10 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-10 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1160ER) | |
2012-03-10 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senate receded from amendment (37-Y 1-N) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Reconsideration receding from amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Senate receded from amendment (28-Y 10-N) | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2012-03-06 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 51-N) | |
2012-03-06 | House: Senate amendment rejected by House (48-Y 51-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-02 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-01 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-29 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Petersen agreed to | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Committee amendment rejected | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Committee amendment reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Chair votes No | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Motion to recommit to committee rejected (20-Y 20-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 4-N 3-A) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House (96-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1160H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105055D-H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105055D-H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2012-01-16 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-16 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12103119D |