VA HB1154 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Litter taxes; amount of tax. Increases the annual litter tax from $10 to $20 and the additional annual litter tax from $15 to $30. Both taxes are imposed on manufacturers, wholesalers, distributors, and retailers of certain products; however, the additional tax applies to fewer businesses.
Title
Litter taxes; increases annual amount of tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 782 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1154ER) |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 1-N 2-A) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 46-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-10 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (50-Y 47-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (50-Y 47-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Finance (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101682D |