VA HB1153 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Issuance of restricted commercial driver's licenses; non-driving offenses; penalties. Authorizes a court that has issued an order authorizing a person subject to a suspension of his driving privileges for nonpayment of (i) child support, (ii) fees owed to local correctional facilities or jails, or (iii) court fines or costs to operate a motor vehicle for the purpose of travel during the hours of such person's employment to order that such person be issued a restricted commercial driver's license for the same purpose. The bill requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue a restricted license upon receipt of any such order. The provisions of the bill are contingent upon receipt by the Virginia Department of Transportation of written assurance from the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration of the U.S. Department of Transportation that Virginia will not lose any federal funds as a result of its implementation.
Title
Commercial driver's licenses, restricted; issuance for non-driving offenses, penalties.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Transportation |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103153D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 320.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 320.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 324.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.14:01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.15:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 395 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |