VA HB1148 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services. Reorganizes provisions of the Code related to the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services. The State Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program is relocated in the Code and the Respite Care Grant Program is eliminated. The bill also calls for additional education services to be provided by the Department with respect to Alzheimer's disease and related disorders.
Title
Aging and Rehabilitative Services, Department of; reorganizes provisions.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 728 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1148ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Social Service and Corrections |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (9-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-27 | House | VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 20100723D-E |
2020-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1148E |
2020-01-24 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-21 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Social Services |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100723D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 5 | 125 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 128 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 131 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 132 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 134 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 139 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 142 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 152 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 155 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 158 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 182 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 5 | 185 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |