VA HB1148 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reporting on economic growth-sharing agreements. Provides that all economic growth-sharing agreements between localities shall require, at least annually, a report from each locality that is a recipient of funds pursuant to the agreement to each of the other governing bodies of the participating localities that includes (i) the amount of money transferred among the localities pursuant to the agreement and (ii) the uses of such funds by the localities. The bill also provides that the parties to any growth-sharing agreement that has been in effect for at least 10 years and that has annual payments that exceed $5 million shall also convene an annual meeting to discuss anticipated future plans for economic growth in the localities.
Title
Economic growth-sharing; review of agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0728) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 728 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1148ER) |
2018-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-27 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1148H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18107021D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107021D-H1 |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104785D |