VA HB1144 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Children alleged to be abused or neglected; preliminary removal hearing; appointment of counsel for parent of such child. Provides that at a preliminary removal hearing in cases in which a child is alleged to have been abused or neglected, the court shall appoint an attorney-at-law to represent such child's parent, guardian, or other adult standing in loco parentis if the court determines that such parent, guardian, or other adult standing in loco parentis is indigent, unless he has waived his right to representation or otherwise employed counsel. Under current law, any such appointment is made at an adjudicatory hearing on such removal after a preliminary removal order is issued.
Title
Children alleged to be abused or neglected; preliminary removal hearing.
Sponsors
Del. AC Cordoza [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-29 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102643D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 251 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 252 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 266 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |