VA HB1141 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0842)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0842)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health benefit plans; special exception. Eliminates provisions of the Code of Virginia authorizing health carriers to sell, issue, or offer for sale any health benefit plan that would otherwise not be permitted to be sold, issued, or offered for sale due to conflict with the requirements of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA), to the extent that the requirements of the PPACA are amended by any federal law.
Title
Health benefit plans; renewal of plans, special exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (61-Y 37-N) (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (67-Y 32-N) (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (11-Y 8-N) (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (67-Y 32-N) (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (11-Y 8-N) (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0842) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 842 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1141ER) |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (61-Y 37-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20109388D-S1 (61-Y 37-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1141S1 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20109388D-S1 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20109388D-S1 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (67-Y 32-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (67-Y 32-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1141H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106904D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (11-Y 8-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106904D-H1 |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100778D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3407.11:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3430.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3431 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3432.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3438 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3444 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3449 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3454.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3514.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3520 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3607 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4123 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4322 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 508.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |