VA HB114 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Special lifetime hunting and fishing licenses; volunteer firefighters and emergency medical services personnel. Qualifies volunteer firefighters and emergency medical services personnel who have completed three consecutive years of service to obtain basic resident lifetime hunting and fishing licenses without any fee. The applicant is required to provide proof of the three years of consecutive service when applying.
Title
Volunteer firefighters and emergency personnel; special lifetime hunting and fishing licenses.
Sponsors
Del. Marie March [R] | Del. AC Cordoza [R] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Chris Runion [R] |
Del. Kim Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101269D |
Subjects
Emergency Services and Vehicles
Firefighters and Fire Marshals
Fishing Laws and Licenses
Hunting Laws and Permits
Wildlife Inland Fisheries and Boating
Firefighters and Fire Marshals
Fishing Laws and Licenses
Hunting Laws and Permits
Wildlife Inland Fisheries and Boating