VA HB1138 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Loudoun County School Board; staggering of member terms; lot drawing; timeframe. Requires the lot drawing required to be conducted by the Loudoun County Electoral Board to determine the members of four of nine districts who will be elected to the Loudoun County School Board for four-year terms and the members of the remaining five districts who will be elected to the Loudoun County School Board for two-year terms to ensure the staggering of member terms for such school board to be conducted at the electoral board's first meeting of 2023 but no later than January 31, 2023.
Title
Loudoun County School Board; staggering of member terms, lot drawing, timeframe.
Sponsors
Del. David Reid [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 22-N) (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 22-N) (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798) | |
2022-05-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 798 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022 | |
2022-04-27 | House | Communicated to Governor on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 22-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 48-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (51-Y 48-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | Pending question ordered |
2022-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-04-11 | House | Governor's substitute printed 22108113D-H1 |
2022-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1138ER) |
2022-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2022-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22103881D |