VA HB1137 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Commuter Rail Operating and Capital Fund. Establishes the Commuter Rail Operating and Capital Fund to be used by the Director of the Department of Rail and Public Transportation, with the approval of the Commonwealth Transportation Board, on projects that expand and improve commuter rail service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commuter Rail Operating and Capital Fund; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30HouseLeft in Transportation
2018-02-06HouseContinued to 2019 in Transportation by voice vote
2018-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Ad Hoc Subcommittee #4
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102127D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3321604(n/a)See Bill Text
3321605(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback