VA HB1134 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1134

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate General Laws and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity; definitions; small business. Redefines "small business" for the purposes of programs for the Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity and the Virginia Public Procurement Act to mean a business that together with its affiliates has both 250 or fewer employees and average annual gross receipts of $10 million or less averaged over the previous three years. Currently for these programs, a business qualifies as a small business if, together with its affiliates, it has either 250 or fewer employees or average annual gross receipts of $10 million or less averaged over the previous three years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business and Supplier Diversity, Department of; redefines small business.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 26-N 1-A) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateContinued to 2021 in General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (72-Y 26-N 1-A)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (72-Y 26-N 1-A)
2020-02-10HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-06HouseReported from General Laws (19-Y 2-N)
2020-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101639D

Same As/Similar To

HB1134 (Carry Over) 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221604(n/a)See Bill Text
221617(n/a)See Bill Text
224310(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback