VA HB1134 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; persons age 65 or older. Entitles a person who will be age 65 or older on the day of an election to vote by absentee ballot in that election.
Title
Absentee voting; persons age 65 or older.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103589D |