VA HB113 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Committee substitute printed 20108717D-S1
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Protected information; newspersons engaged in journalism. Provides that no newsperson engaged in journalism shall be compelled by the Commonwealth or a locality to testify about, disclose, or produce protected information, as defined in the bill, except when the court finds that (i) the protected information is necessary to the proof of an issue material to an administrative, civil, or criminal proceeding; (ii) the protected information is not obtainable from any alternative source; (iii) the Commonwealth or locality exhausted all reasonable methods for obtaining the protected information from all relevant alternative sources, if applicable; and (iv) there is an overriding public interest in the disclosure of the protected information, including preventing harm to or death of a person. The bill further provides that any information obtained in violation of the provisions of the bill shall be inadmissible for any purpose in an administrative, civil, or criminal proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protected information; newspersons engaged in journalism, definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (60-Y 39-N) (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108717D-S1
2020-02-19SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Passage (60-Y 39-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House (60-Y 39-N)
2020-02-07HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB113H1
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107678D-H1
2020-02-07HouseRead second time
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107678D-H1
2020-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 2-N)
2020-01-30HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2019-12-13HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-12-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100888D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192325(n/a)See Bill Text
801410.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback